Boffoli v. Twitter, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Christopher Boffoli
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv01534
Filed: September 10, 2012
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2012 ***Civil Case Terminated. (RS)
October 25, 2012 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Christopher Boffoli (Scully, Keith)
October 19, 2012 13 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to 11/7/12 to answer by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
October 17, 2012 12 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Answer by parties. (Ferguson, Nathan)
October 4, 2012 11 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend time to file answer by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
October 2, 2012 10 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik for all further proceedings. Hon. Mary Alice Theiler no longer assigned to case. (JT)
October 1, 2012 Reset Deadlines: If consent or decline, return the executed form by 10/12/2012. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (JT)
October 1, 2012 9 MINUTE ORDER re: 8 Stipulation filed by Twitter, Inc. by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. As this pending motion cannot be ruled upon until the consent issue is resolved, the deadline for filing consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge is now October 12, 2012. (JT)
October 1, 2012 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Answer by parties. (Ferguson, Nathan)
October 1, 2012 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nathan E. Ferguson on behalf of Defendant Twitter, Inc.. (Ferguson, Nathan)
September 26, 2012 6 AMENDED REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. E-mailed to the US Patent Office. (Original Report, doc. #5, did not have counsel's copy attached) (Attachments: # 1 Patent Report completed by counsel) (PM)
September 11, 2012 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. E-mailed to the US Patent Office. (Attachments: # 1 Patent Report form completed by counsel) (PM) Modified on 9/26/2012 incorrect image attached. See next docket entry for correction(PM).
September 11, 2012 4 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 10/23/2012, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/9/2012, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/16/2012, by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (JT)
September 11, 2012 NOTICE to Filer of Deficiency - PATENT/TRADEMARK/COPYRIGHT REPORT OMISSION:Pursuant to our local rules, Civil Rule 3(a), all civil action complaints in which jurisdiction is invoked in whole or in part under 28 U.S.C. § 1338 (regarding patents, trademarks and copyrights) shall be accompanied by the required notice to the Patent and Trademark Office (Form AO120) or the required notice to the Register of Copyrights (Form AO121). If this is such a case, please complete the appropriate form and email it back to the new cases box at newcases.seattle@wawd.uscourts.gov. Please include in the subject line the name and number of the case and the name of the document attached. This form will then be posted to the case docket and a copy sent to the appropriate entity.(MKB)
September 11, 2012 3 Summons Issued as to defendant Twitter, Inc. (MKB)
September 11, 2012 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT OR DECLINE FORM. If consent or decline, return the executed form by 10/23/2012. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (MKB)
September 11, 2012 Judge Mary Alice Theiler added. (MKB)
September 10, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Twitter, Inc. (Receipt # 0981-2940768), filed by Christopher Boffoli. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Scully, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boffoli v. Twitter, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Boffoli
Represented By: Keith P Scully
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan E. Ferguson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]