MMMT Holdings Corporation v. NSGI Holdings Inc

Plaintiff: MMMT Holdings Corporation
Defendant: NSGI Holdings Inc
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01570
Filed: September 14, 2012
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2014 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 112 Motion to file third amended complaint ; denying pltf's 116 Motion to modify scheduling order by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
January 18, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY by Judge Robert S. Lasnik; Deft's 39 motion to stay discovery is GRANTED. (TF)
September 10, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik; Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2013. (TF)
September 27, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying dft NSGI's 52 Motion for Protective Order by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: MMMT Holdings Corporation v. NSGI Holdings Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MMMT Holdings Corporation
Represented By: William B. Stafford
Represented By: William Z Pentelovitch
Represented By: Kevin J Hamilton
Represented By: Jennifer B Benowitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSGI Holdings Inc
Represented By: George G Eck
Represented By: James E Howard
Represented By: Heather McCann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]