Neff et al v. Old Republic Title Ltd

Plaintiff: Peggy A. Neff and Geoffrey E. Neff
Defendant: Old Republic Title Ltd
Case Number: 2:2012cv02019
Filed: November 16, 2012
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 22 Stipulated Motion for Order to Stay Proceedings by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(TF)
November 18, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion preliminarily approving class action settlement, striking case deadlines, authorizing distribution of class notice and setting final approval hearing for 3/13/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert S. Lasnik by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
March 13, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Judgment and Decree Granting final approval to Class action Settlement, Approving attorney fee Award, Apporving representative Plaintiffs' Award and dismissing Claims with Prejudice re: 32 30 , by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MD, cc to Fin'l Dept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neff et al v. Old Republic Title Ltd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy A. Neff
Represented By: Roblin John Williamson
Represented By: Adam J Berger
Represented By: Martin S Garfinkel
Represented By: Guy William Beckett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoffrey E. Neff
Represented By: Roblin John Williamson
Represented By: Martin S Garfinkel
Represented By: Adam J Berger
Represented By: Guy William Beckett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Title Ltd
Represented By: Gavin Williams Skok
Represented By: Scott A. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]