RIPL Corp. v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: RIPL Corp
Defendant: Google Inc
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02050
Filed: November 21, 2012
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Clallam
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *3 days*. Jury Trial is set for 1/27/2014 at 9:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 4/12/2013, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/31/2013, Motions due by 8/30/2013, Discovery completed by 9/30/2013, Dispositive motions due by 10/29/2013, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 7/31/2013, Motions in Limine due by 12/30/2013, Pretrial Order due by 1/15/2014, Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/22/2014, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 1/22/2014, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
March 12, 2013 17 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 3. Filed by Defendant Google Inc.(Rava, William)
March 6, 2013 Reset Deadlines: Per request of counsel, deadline for filing Joint Status Report continued to 3/15/2013. (LC)
January 24, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 3/7/2013, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/21/2013, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/28/2013, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
January 18, 2013 15 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Google Inc.(Rava, William)
December 20, 2012 14 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Stipulated Motion to extend time to answer complaint by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
December 19, 2012 Attorney Holly Marie Simpkins for Google Inc added per 9 Notice of Appearance. (KN)
December 18, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER re 11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Timothy L Alger for Google Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
December 18, 2012 12 Stipulated MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/18/2012, (Rava, William)
December 18, 2012 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Timothy L. Alger FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Google Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3050726. (Attachments: # 1 ECF Registration)(Rava, William)
December 18, 2012 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Defendant Google Inc. (Rava, William)
December 18, 2012 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William C Rava on behalf of Defendant Google Inc. (Rava, William)
November 28, 2012 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Plaintiff RIPL Corp. (Mann, Philip)
November 23, 2012 7 Summons electronically issued as to defendant(s) Google Inc. (RE)
November 23, 2012 Judge Ricardo S Martinez added. (RE)
November 23, 2012 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1 Plaintiff(s) RIPL Corporation must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/30/2012. (RE)
November 23, 2012 NOTICE TO FILER: DOCUMENTS REQUIRED BUT NOT ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT:In the future please remember the Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, and Trademark/Patent Report and the all Summons(es) should be attachments to your Complaint. (RE)
November 21, 2012 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of a Trademark action. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Trademark Report filed by counsel) (RE) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/23/2012) (RE).
November 21, 2012 5 PRAECIPE re 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff RIPL Corp.. (Mann, Philip)
November 21, 2012 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff RIPL Corp.. (Mann, Philip)
November 21, 2012 3 REPORT on Filing Trademark Action by Plaintiff RIPL Corp.. (Mann, Philip)
November 21, 2012 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff RIPL Corp... (Mann, Philip)
November 21, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs (Receipt # 0981-3023402), filed by RIPL Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mann, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: RIPL Corp. v. Google Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RIPL Corp
Represented By: Philip P Mann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Represented By: Timothy L Alger
Represented By: William C Rava
Represented By: Holly Marie Simpkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]