Washington Research Foundation v. Apple, Inc. et al Featured Case

Defendant: D-Link Systems, Inc., Apple, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Logitech International S.A., Logitech Inc, Microsoft Corporation, Parrot SA, Parrot, Inc, Samsung Electronics Company, Limited and Samsung Electronics America, Incorporated
Plaintiff: Washington Research Foundation
Case Number: 2:2012cv02092
Filed: November 30, 2012
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 31, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (AE)
December 28, 2012 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Washington Research Foundation (Curtin, Victoria)
December 10, 2012 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Plaintiff Washington Research Foundation. (Curtin, Victoria)
December 3, 2012 NOTICE to Filer - NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The Complaint was improperly signed by Jonathan Yeh. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 11 and Local General Rule 2(h), signatures must comply with Section III(L) of the Electronic Filing Procedures, which states, "An electronically filed pleading or other document which requires an attorney's signature must have the signors' names' printed or typed on the line and under all signature lines. You do not have to re-file this document, but please be sure all future documents are properly signed. Thank you. (MKB)
December 3, 2012 9 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. E-mailed to the US Patent Office. (Attachments: # 1 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form120)) (MKB)
December 3, 2012 8 DISREGARD SEE 9 WITH ATTACHMENT -REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. E-mailed to the US Patent Office. (MKB) Modified on 12/3/2012 (MKB).
December 3, 2012 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1 Plaintiff must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/10/2012. (MKB)
December 3, 2012 7 Summonses issued as to all Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons)(MKB)
December 3, 2012 Judge Brian A Tsuchida added. (MKB)
November 30, 2012 6 Featured Case ORDER re 3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Victoria G Curtin for Washington Research Foundation, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(JEM)
November 30, 2012 5 Featured Case ORDER re 2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gerald D Hosier for Washington Research Foundation, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(JEM)
November 30, 2012 4 REPORT on Filing of Action Regarding Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120) by Plaintiff Washington Research Foundation. (Yeh, Jonathan)
November 30, 2012 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Victoria Gruver Curtin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Washington Research Foundation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3031618. (Yeh, Jonathan)
November 30, 2012 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gerald D. Hosier FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Washington Research Foundation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3031601. (Yeh, Jonathan)
November 30, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-3031515), filed by Washington Research Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons)(Yeh, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington Research Foundation v. Apple, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-Link Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logitech International S.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logitech Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parrot SA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parrot, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Company, Limited
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Incorporated
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington Research Foundation
Represented By: Jonathan Yeh
Represented By: Gerald D Hosier
Represented By: Charles Dean Little
Represented By: Victoria G Curtin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]