R.H. v. Premera Blue Cross et al

Defendant: Lifewise Health Plan of Washington and Premera Blue Cross
Plaintiff: R.H.
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00097
Filed: January 16, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Thurston
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2014 65 Featured Case ORDER granting 60 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Certify Class; denying 62 Unopposed Motion for preliminary approval of settlement agreement, by Judge Richard A Jones.(MD)
July 21, 2014 67 Featured Case ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 66 Motion for Reconsideration by Judge Richard A Jones. The court ORDERS plaintiff to file renewed motion no later than July 30, 2014.(LMK)
August 6, 2014 72 Featured Case ORDER re Plaintiff's 68 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement by Judge Richard A Jones. Final Approval Hearing set for 1/9/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard A Jones.(LMK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: R.H. v. Premera Blue Cross et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifewise Health Plan of Washington
Represented By: Barbara J Duffy
Represented By: Ryan P McBride
Represented By: Gwendolyn C. Payton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premera Blue Cross
Represented By: Barbara J Duffy
Represented By: Ryan P McBride
Represented By: Gwendolyn C. Payton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.H.
Represented By: Eleanor Hamburger
Represented By: Richard E Spoonemore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]