Sali v. United States of America

Petitioner: Ismail Sali
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2013cv00116
Filed: January 18, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting govt's 6 Motion re waiver of attorney-client privilege ; denying petitioner's 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS) cc Sali
January 24, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying petitioner's 2255 Motion ; denying petitioner's 16 Motion for transcripts and a continuance by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS) cc Sali
April 3, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik; It is hereby ordered that the Govt's answer to pet's Section 2255 motion shall be due 6/3/2013. (TF) cc: I Sali

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sali v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ismail Sali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Steven Toshio Masada
Represented By: Richard Edward Cohen
Represented By: Norman McIntosh Barbosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.