Interval Licensing LLC v. Google, Inc Featured Case

Plaintiff: Interval Licensing LLC
Defendant: Google, Inc
Counter_claimant: Google, Inc
Counter_defendant: Interval Licensing LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv00265
Filed: February 13, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2013 10 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC for proceedings held on December 12, 2012 Requesting Attorney: Nathan J. Davis. (Davis, Nathan)
April 1, 2013 9 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER (13-1284)received from Federal Circuit as to 8 Notice of Appeal, filed by Interval Licensing LLC :(LMK)
March 26, 2013 APPEAL NOTIFICATION packet sent to US FEDERAL CIRCUIT re 8 Notice of Appeal (SA)
March 26, 2013 Appeal Remark re 8 Notice of Appeal : Docket text corrected: Notice of Appeal to FEDERAL CIRCUIT. (SA)
March 26, 2013 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL to FEDERAL CIRCUIT (13-1284) re 7 Judgment by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. Filing Fee $455, Receipt number 0981-3154089. (Nelson, Justin) Modified on 3/26/2013, corrected to Federal Circuit (SA). Modified on 4/2/2013; added Federal Circuit number (LMK).
February 28, 2013 7 Featured Case STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (Attachments: # 1 Claim Construction Order)(MD)
February 26, 2013 6 MOTION AMENDED STIPULATED PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER by Defendant Google, Inc, Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. Noting Date 2/26/2013, (Nelson, Justin)
February 25, 2013 5 MOTION STIPULATED PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER by Defendant Google, Inc, Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. Noting Date 2/25/2013, (Nelson, Justin)
February 19, 2013 4 ANSWER to 3 Amended Complaint,,, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC by Google, Inc.(Jost, Shannon)
February 15, 2013 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against defendant(s) Google, Inc with JURY DEMAND, filed by Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40)(Nelson, Justin)
February 14, 2013 2 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER - re: Court's Order on Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Sever Claims and filing of certain documents in the severed cases. (Dkt No. 345 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP) (1 in 2:13-cv-00265-MJP) Order, (1 in 2:13-cv-00263-MJP) Order, (1 in 2:13-cv-00264-MJP) Order on Motion to Sever, (1 in 2:13-cv-00266-MJP), by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (Minute Order filed in C10-1385MJP; C13-263MJP, C13-264MJP; C13-265MJP and C13-166MJP)(MD)
February 14, 2013 1 Featured Case ORDER on Interval's Unopposed motion to sever claims and enter final judgment of invalidity and non-infringement, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (Lead Case Number is C10-1385MJP) by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Interval Licensing LLC v. Google, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interval Licensing LLC
Represented By: Douglas R. Wilson
Represented By: Max L. Tribble
Represented By: Jeffrey M Thomas
Represented By: Edgar Guy Sargent
Represented By: Niraj P. Patel
Represented By: Justin A Nelson
Represented By: Michael F. Heim
Represented By: Andres C Healy
Represented By: Eric J. Enger
Represented By: Oleg Elkhunovich
Represented By: Nathan J. Davis
Represented By: Robert A. Bullwinkel
Represented By: Matthew R Berry
Represented By: Matthew Behncke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc
Represented By: Warren S. Heit
Represented By: Dimitrios T. Drivas
Represented By: Aaron Chase
Represented By: Scott A.W. Johnson
Represented By: Shannon M Jost
Represented By: Kevin X. McGann
Represented By: Wendi R. Schepler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Google, Inc
Represented By: Aaron Chase
Represented By: Dimitrios T. Drivas
Represented By: Warren S. Heit
Represented By: Scott A.W. Johnson
Represented By: Shannon M Jost
Represented By: Kevin X. McGann
Represented By: Wendi R. Schepler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Interval Licensing LLC
Represented By: Matthew Behncke
Represented By: Matthew R Berry
Represented By: Robert A. Bullwinkel
Represented By: Nathan J. Davis
Represented By: Oleg Elkhunovich
Represented By: Eric J. Enger
Represented By: Andres C Healy
Represented By: Michael F. Heim
Represented By: Justin A Nelson
Represented By: Niraj P. Patel
Represented By: Edgar Guy Sargent
Represented By: Jeffrey M Thomas
Represented By: Max L. Tribble
Represented By: Douglas R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.