Richardson v. United States of America

Petitioner: Irisha Shalle Richardson
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2013cv00373
Filed: March 1, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting govt's 12 Second Motion re waiver of attorney-client privilege ; granting in part and denying in part defense counsel's 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel for Petitioner ; atty David Bukey appointed for limited purpose of being present during interview of Ms. Shaw by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS) cc Bukey
February 24, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Third Motion re waiver of attorney-client privilege; govt's request for additional time to answer is granted in part by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS) petitioner
May 21, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2255 Motion by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS) cc Richardson
April 24, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE ANSWER TO PETITIONER'S MOTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 2255 TO VACATE, SET ASIDE, OR CORRECT SENTENCE by Judge Robert S. Lasnik; The Government has until 6/19/2013, to file its response to the Petitioner's Motion. (TF) cc: I Richardson

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Irisha Shalle Richardson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Catherine L Crisham
Represented By: Carl A Colasurdo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]