Lacey Marketplace Associates II LLC v. United Farmers of Alberta Co-Operative Limited et al

Plaintiff: Lacey Marketplace Associates II LLC
Defendant: United Farmers of Alberta Co-Operative Limited, Wholesale Sports USA, Inc., Alamo Group LLC, Donald F Gaube and Jane Doe Gaube
Case Number: 2:2013cv00383
Filed: March 4, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2015 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - granting 101 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 117 Sportsman's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 119 UFA 9;s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 121 UFA's Motion to extend the trial length, Court Strikes Alamo, Wholesale, and Mr. Gaube's Motion to Join 121 . Court directs the clerk to Seal the exhibit filed at docket no. 118-8 and directs Sportsman to file a redacted version of this exhibit that comports with Local Rule, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
March 4, 2015 178 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
May 14, 2015 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 220 UFA's Renewed Motion for judgment as a matter of law and motion for a new trial, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD) Modified on 5/14/2015 - cc to pro se parties (MD).
May 21, 2015 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 193 Plaintiff's Motion for prejudgment interest, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD) Modified on 5/21/2015- cc to pro se party (MD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lacey Marketplace Associates II LLC v. United Farmers of Alberta Co-Operative Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacey Marketplace Associates II LLC
Represented By: Haley K. Krug
Represented By: Jeffrey I Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Farmers of Alberta Co-Operative Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wholesale Sports USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alamo Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald F Gaube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Gaube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.