Voltage Pictures, LLC v. Does 1-78

Defendant: Does 1-78
Plaintiff: Voltage Pictures LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00456
Filed: March 13, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as Moot 10 Motion to Quash by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (CL) (cc: K. Eddy)
May 29, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 15 Motion to Quash as Moot by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(TF) cc: S Daymon, K Eddy
March 27, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 5 Motion for Preliminary Discovery by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
May 10, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND QUASHING SUBPOENAS by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (CL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Voltage Pictures, LLC v. Does 1-78
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-78
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Voltage Pictures LLC
Represented By: Richard J. Symmes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]