Elf-Man, LLC v. Does 1-152 Featured Case

Plaintiff: Elf Man LLC
Defendant: Does 1-152
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00507
Filed: March 20, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER Denying 13 Motion to Quash as Moot by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(TF) cc: pro se interested parties
August 7, 2013 30 Featured Case ORDER LIFTING STAY AND EXTENDING SERVICE DEADLINE by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Plaintiff shall have seventy days from the date of this Order to complete discovery and affect service. (CL) (cc: J. Couture, J. Funseth)
March 26, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER granting pltf's 2 Motion for Preliminary Discovery by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
January 17, 2014 78 Featured Case ORDER granting 60 Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Granting Leave to Amend by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MD) Modified on 1/17/2014-mailed copy of order to pro se parties (MD).
March 14, 2014 89 Featured Case STIPULATED MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR ENTRY OF ORDER PERMANENTLY ENJOINING FUTURE INFRINGEMENT AS TO DEFENDANT LEON KIMMERLING ONLY by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Elf-Man, LLC v. Does 1-152
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elf Man LLC
Represented By: Maureen VanderMay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-152
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]