The Thompsons Film, LLC v. Does 1-194

Plaintiff: The Thompsons Film, LLC
Defendant: Does 1-194
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00560
Filed: March 28, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 11 MOTION TO QUASH AS MOOT by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(TF) cc: S Fastrup
May 29, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 17 Motion to Quash as Moot by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(TF) cc: S Fastrup, P Wilson
August 7, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY AND EXTENDING SERVICE DEADLINE by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Plaintiff shall have eighty days from the date of this Order to complete discovery and affect service. The court DENIES Doe 51'S motion to sever or dismiss and request for a protective order (Dkt. # 27 ). (CL)(cc: pro se parties)
February 14, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting dfts' 59 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Doan'nhi Nguyen, Gino Wall, Kimberly Banks and Eric Morris dismissed. Pltf to file second amended complaint within 14 days by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS) cc pro se parties

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: The Thompsons Film, LLC v. Does 1-194
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Thompsons Film, LLC
Represented By: Maureen VanderMay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-194
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]