Lucero v. Cenlar FSB, et al

Defendant: Cenlar FSB and Bayview Loan Servicing LLC
Plaintiff: Leticia Lucero
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00602
Filed: April 3, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2014 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 82 . The motion to dismiss filed by Cenlar, MERS, Dobron, and Morris is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's RESPA § 2605(e)(2) claim against Cenlar, part of her FDCPA claim, part of the CPA claim, and theTILA claim are hereby DISMISSED. Plaintiff is hereby granted leave to amend the RESPA and TILA claims. Plaintiff may proceed with discovery regarding all of her other claims against the moving defendants. Plaintiff's request for Rule 11 sanctions is DENIED, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(TM)
October 3, 2014 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part Bayview's Motion to Dismiss by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Bayviews 90 motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs RESPA and CPA claims are DISMISSED. Plaintiffs FDCPA claim regarding communications with a represented consumer are DISMISSED with leave to amend. (LMK)
June 27, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The Clerk is directedto place this Order to Show Cause on the Court's calendar for July 12, 2013. (CL)
October 4, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting pltf's 28 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
June 10, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entering stipulation of plaintiff and RCO Legal PS re deposition of RCO Legal PS by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
July 1, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part RCO's 63 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; show cause ddl within 14 days by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lucero v. Cenlar FSB, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cenlar FSB
Represented By: Charles Elliot Katz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Charles Elliot Katz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia Lucero
Represented By: Vicente Omar Barraza
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]