MKB Constructors v. American Zurich Insurance Company

Plaintiff: MKB Constructors
Defendant: American Zurich Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2013cv00611
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Clallam
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2014 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - Granting in part and Denying in part 91 MKB's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Granting in part and Denying in part 93 American Zurich's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
September 29, 2014 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 115 American Zurich's Motion for Rule 37 sanctions against MKB, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
October 2, 2014 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 130 Plainiff's Motion for Reconsideration by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
June 5, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 52 Motion to Bifurcate by Judge James L. Robart.(RS)
July 28, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 79 Plaintiffs Third Motion to Compel, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MKB Constructors v. American Zurich Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MKB Constructors
Represented By: Stephen L. Nourse
Represented By: A Richard Dykstra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Zurich Insurance Company
Represented By: Rebecca B Aherne
Represented By: Jonathan R. Gross
Represented By: Jose Dino Vasquez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]