Seaway Properties, LLC v. Fireman's Fund Insurance Company

Defendant: Associated Indemnity Corporation and Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Seaway Properties, LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv00633
Filed: April 8, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The court GRANTS the parties' stipulated motion (Dkt. # 35 ) to relieve them of case deadlines pending the court's disposition of their cross-motions for summary judgment. The clerk shall VACATE all pending pretrial deadlines and the trial date. (CL)
April 22, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The court DENIES Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. # 19 ) except that it rules that Fireman's Fund is not liable to Seaway as a matter of law. The court GRANTS Seaway's cross-motion for pa rtial summary judgment (Dkt. # 26 ) except to the extent that it seeks to hold Fireman's Fund liable. The court sets December 8, 2014 as the trial date. The clerk shall issue a new order resetting the pretrial deadlines that the court vacated. (CL)
May 14, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. As per the parties' 41 stipulation, the court corrects a single typographical error in the Order on Summary Judgment, docket no. 39 . (CL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seaway Properties, LLC v. Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Indemnity Corporation
Represented By: Emilia L Sweeney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Represented By: Emilia L Sweeney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seaway Properties, LLC
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Martens
Represented By: Rose K McGillis
Represented By: Steven A Stolle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]