Tse v. United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 367 et al

Defendant: United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 367 and Does
Plaintiff: Wing Kai Tse
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00746
Filed: April 29, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The court GRANTS plaintiff's 11 motion to extend the time to file a notice of appeal. (CL) Modified on 4/3/2014 (CL). (cc: pltf)
April 15, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The court GRANTS plaintiffs 14 motion to extend the time to file a notice of appeal.(CL) (cc: pltf)
April 22, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Pltf's request for extension for filing the notice of appeal by Judge Richard A Jones. The court has already granted plaintiff's prior requests for extension of time. He has until April 23, 2014 to file a notice of appeal. The court will not respond to any further requests from plaintiff in this case.1 This case is closed.(CL) (cc: pltf)
February 19, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The court GRANTS defendants' motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of defendant and against plaintiff. (CL) (cc: pltf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Tse v. United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 367 et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 367
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wing Kai Tse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]