Beals v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Plaintiff: Sheena M. Beals
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00773
Filed: May 2, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 19 MOTION to Remand (Stipulated) by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida; Noting Date 9/30/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Judgment)(TF)
October 1, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida; The Court adopts the 20 Report and Recommendation, the Commissioner's decision is REVERSED, and the case is REMANDED to the Social Security Administration. (TF)
February 14, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge John C Coughenour; The Court adopts the 28 Report and Recommendation in full. (TF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Beals v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheena M. Beals
Represented By: Sara M Herr-Waldroup
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]