Olson v. University of Washington

Defendant: University of Washington, Shari Spung, Richard Cordova, Edwina S. Uehara, Michael K Young and John Doe
Plaintiff: W. GARY OLSON
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00782
Filed: May 3, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2014 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 47 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and denying Plaintiff's 64 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Shari Spung (in her official and individual capacities) and Michael K Young (in his official and individual capacities) are TERMINATED as defendants' to this lawsuit with prejudice, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TM)
September 10, 2014 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. Plaintiff's Motions 79 and 86 for Relief from Deadlines are Granted in Part and Denied in Part; Plaintiff's 98 Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint is Denied; Plaint iff's 103 Motion to Compel is Granted in Part and Denied in Part; Defendants' 109 Motion for Protective Order is Stricken as Untimely; Plaintiff's 113 Motion for Relief Denied as Moot; Plaintiff's 114 Motion for Protec tive Order is Denied as Premature; Plaintiff's 134 Motion for Extension of Time is Stricken as Moot. Defendants' 92 MOTION to Compel has been renoted by clerk to 9/19/2014. The Clerk reset Parties' Discovery deadline to 10/15/2014 and parties' Dispositive motions deadline to 10/31/2014. The Court addresses each the motions, and also warns the parties that additional voluminous motion filings may result in monetary sanctions.(LMK)
September 16, 2014 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 92 Motion to Compel Production of email. Plaintiff shall produce unredacted copies of the same emails provided to the Court to Defendants NO LATER than five (5) days from the date of this Order, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(TM)
November 4, 2014 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting dfts' 141 Motion to strike expert Horrell by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Olson v. University of Washington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Washington
Represented By: Andrew G Cooley
Represented By: Mary Ann McConaughy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shari Spung
Represented By: Andrew G Cooley
Represented By: Mary Ann McConaughy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Cordova
Represented By: Mary Ann McConaughy
Represented By: Andrew G Cooley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwina S. Uehara
Represented By: Mary Ann McConaughy
Represented By: Andrew G Cooley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael K Young
Represented By: Andrew G Cooley
Represented By: Mary Ann McConaughy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. GARY OLSON
Represented By: Neil H Robblee
Represented By: Neil H Robblee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]