Strich v. Accelitec, Inc.

Defendant: Accelitec, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ronald F Strich
Counter_claimant: Accelitec, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Ronald F Strich
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01092
Filed: June 25, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2013 18 Featured Case AGREEMENT REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TF)
November 8, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER granting pltf's 6 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
November 8, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part pltf's 8 Motion to Dismiss dft's counterclaims by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
December 9, 2013 29 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TF)
February 5, 2014 37 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 21 Motion for Writ of attachment and for conducting deposition discovery past the discovery cutoff; renoting 32 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment : Noting Date 2/28/2014, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (Attachments: # 1 Writ of Attachment signed by Clerk, # 2 Attachment Lien signed by Judge Lasnik)(RS)
April 15, 2014 49 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part pltf's 32 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
May 13, 2014 53 Featured Case JUDGMENT BY COURT; Plaintiff is entitled to judgment on the First Cause of Action in the amount of $1,000,000 in unpaid principal, $240,876.71 in unpaid interest as of June 22, 2013, and prejudgment interest. Plaintiff is entitled to judgment on the Second Cause of Action in the principal amount of $348,000 and interest of $83,596.27 through November 30, 2013, plus prejudgment interest at the contractual rate of 8%. (CL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Strich v. Accelitec, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accelitec, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Lee Karlberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald F Strich
Represented By: Aimee K Decker
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Accelitec, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Lee Karlberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Ronald F Strich
Represented By: Aimee K Decker
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]