Costco Wholesale Corp. v. Au Optronics Corp. et al

Defendant: LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co., Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA) Inc, Hitachi Displays Ltd, Hitachi Ltd, Hannstar Display Corp., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Epson Electronics America Inc, CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corp., Au Optronics Corporation America, Au Optronics Corp., Toshiba Corp., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Toshiba Corporation and Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Costco Wholesale Corp.
Special_master: Martin Quinn
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01207
Filed: July 9, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
 
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2013 338 Opinion or Order of the Court MDL CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER to the transferor Courts. Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi for the MDL panel on 7/8/13. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013) [Transferred from cand on 7/10/2013.]
October 7, 2013 424 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The court directs the clerk to set a September 8, 2014 trial date. The court GRANTS stipulated motion (Dkt. # 422 ) and orders that Chungwha has no further pretrial obligations. The court orders the parties to file a joint status report no later than November 7, 2014. (CL)
June 16, 2014 480 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER terminating dfts' 467 Motion for Leave to file motions by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
August 8, 2014 522 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones Terminating Defendants' 512 Motion to Seal; Clerk is directed to unseal 513 Sealed Document; Granting 519 Stipulated Motion to Modify Certain Case Schedule Deadlines; Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge Richard A Jones. (LMK)
August 26, 2014 541 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones re Plaintiff's 527 Motion to Seal. Plaintiff filed that motion only to satisfy the terms of a litigation agreement, and no one has offered any reason to keep the documents that are the subject of that motion under seal. The clerk shall UNSEAL the documents that were the subject of the motion. Dkt. ## 528, 534. (LMK)
September 11, 2014 558 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying dfts' 484 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
September 17, 2014 569 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER terminating Defendants' 514 Motion in Limine; terminating Plaintiff's 516 Motion in Limine by Judge Richard A Jones. (see Order for details)(TM)
September 22, 2014 575 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 486 Motion for Summary Judgment application of FTAIA to Costco's Panasonic purchases, by Judge Richard A Jones. (VE)
September 23, 2014 576 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones re 514 MOTIONS IN LIMINE Omnibus Motions in Limine filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., LG Display America Inc. The court denies Defendants' request to exclude evidence related to "umbrella damages." (VE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Costco Wholesale Corp. v. Au Optronics Corp. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display America Inc
Represented By: Lee F Berger
Represented By: Holly A. House
Represented By: Lisa Y Leung
Represented By: Kevin C. McCann
Represented By: Michael Williams Stevens
Represented By: Sean David Unger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Lee F Berger
Represented By: Holly A. House
Represented By: Lisa Y Leung
Represented By: Kevin C. McCann
Represented By: Michael Williams Stevens
Represented By: Sean David Unger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA) Inc
Represented By: Kelly P Corr
Represented By: Herman J Hoying
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Represented By: William Harrison Walsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Displays Ltd
Represented By: Jerry Chen
Represented By: Kelly P Corr
Represented By: Herman J Hoying
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Represented By: William Harrison Walsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Ltd
Represented By: Kelly P Corr
Represented By: Herman J Hoying
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Represented By: William Harrison Walsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannstar Display Corp.
Represented By: Jason Sheffield Angell
Represented By: Mark K Davis
Represented By: Robert E Freitas
Represented By: Jessica N Leal
Represented By: Donald H Mullins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation
Represented By: Derek Francis Foran
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Represented By: Stephen P. Freccero
Represented By: Dana Anthony Rodriguez
Represented By: Christopher Sousa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Electronics America Inc
Represented By: Christopher Sousa
Represented By: Dana Anthony Rodriguez
Represented By: Stephen P. Freccero
Represented By: Derek Francis Foran
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMO Japan Co Ltd
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Scott
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Christopher B Hockett
Represented By: Michael J Ewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd
Represented By: Peter McNaughton Vial
Represented By: Joel Steven Sanders
Represented By: Robert E Freitas
Represented By: Malaika M Eaton
Represented By: Rachel S Brass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Scott
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Christopher B Hockett
Represented By: Michael J Ewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corp.
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Scott
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Christopher B Hockett
Represented By: Michael J Ewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Au Optronics Corporation America
Represented By: James A Nickovich
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: K.C. Maxwell, Esq.
Represented By: David C Lundsgaard
Represented By: Farschad Farzan
Represented By: John D Cline
Represented By: Martha A. Boersch
Represented By: Carl L. Blumenstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Au Optronics Corp.
Represented By: James A Nickovich
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: K.C. Maxwell, Esq.
Represented By: David C Lundsgaard
Represented By: Farschad Farzan
Represented By: John D Cline
Represented By: Martha A. Boersch
Represented By: Carl L. Blumenstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corp.
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Chung
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems Inc
Represented By: John H. Chung
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Mobile Display Co.
Represented By: John H. Chung
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: John H. Chung
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.
Represented By: John H. Chung
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Costco Wholesale Corp.
Represented By: Eric J Weiss
Represented By: Cori Gordon Moore
Represented By: Steven Douglas Merriman
Represented By: Nicholas H Hesterberg
Represented By: David Burman
Represented By: Joren Surya Bass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Martin Quinn
Represented By: Martin Quinn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]