United States of America v. Bryant

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Joseph P Bryant
Case Number: 2:2013cv01256
Filed: July 17, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard A. Jones. The court GRANTS Respondent's 11 motion for extension of time to respond to the order to show cause. Respondent has until June 3, 2014 to respond to the order to show cause (Dkt. # 5). (CL)
June 27, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part respondent's 13 Second Motion for Extension of Time ; respondent must respond to order to show cause within 30 days by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS) cc Bryant
January 10, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Petitioner's 6 Motion extention of time by Judge Richard A Jones. The United States shall have an additional 30 days from the date of this order, to serve Respondent, Joseph P. Bryant. (CL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bryant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Quinn Patrick Harrington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph P Bryant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]