Proshipline Inc et al v. Aspen Infrastructures Ltd et al

Plaintiff: Proshipline Inc and EP-Team Inc
Defendant: Aspen Infrastructures Ltd and Suzlon Infrastructure Ltd
Garnishee: Masters and Pursers, ConocoPhillips, Tesoro Petroleum Corporation, General Steamship Corporation and Jones Stevedoring Company
 
Case Number: 3:2007cv05660
Filed: November 27, 2007
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Cowlitz
Presiding Judge: Franklin D. Burgess
 
Nature of Suit: Marine Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2010 133 Featured Case ORDER Reinstating Writ of Attachment on Behalf of Ep-Team Individually and Reversing Order to Reimburse Aspen for Value of Garnished Property by Judge Benjamin H Settle. Joint status report due by 10/1/2010. (TG)
December 13, 2010 147 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 137 Motion to Vacate. Writ of Attachment on behalf of Ep-Team individually is vacated, as is the Court's prior order (Dkt. 133). (TG)
March 8, 2011 159 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle denying 148 Motion for Reconsideration.(TG)
December 6, 2007 23 Featured Case ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing re 18 Request filed by Aspen Infrastructures Ltd by Judge Franklin D. Burgess. (BWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Proshipline Inc et al v. Aspen Infrastructures Ltd et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Proshipline Inc
Represented By: Steven V Gibbons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EP-Team Inc
Represented By: Steven V Gibbons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Infrastructures Ltd
Represented By: Marc E. Warner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzlon Infrastructure Ltd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Masters and Pursers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: ConocoPhillips
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Tesoro Petroleum Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: General Steamship Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Jones Stevedoring Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]