Trinity Glass International Inc et al v. LG Chem Ltd et al

Plaintiff: Trinity Glass International Inc and Right Concept Inc
Defendant: LG Chem Ltd and LG Chem America Inc
Case Number: 3:2009cv05018
Filed: January 14, 2009
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Contract Product Liability Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2010 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 114 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
March 11, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL, granting 21 . Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
July 8, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, denying 34 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. 34 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike (Dkt. 44 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
August 11, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, by Judge Robert J. Bryan.(DK)
September 2, 2010 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, denying 60 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trinity Glass International Inc et al v. LG Chem Ltd et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinity Glass International Inc
Represented By: Hall Baetz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Right Concept Inc
Represented By: Hall Baetz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem Ltd
Represented By: Grant J Silvernale, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem America Inc
Represented By: Grant J Silvernale, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]