Butler et al v. Great American RV Inc et al

Plaintiff: Charles Butler and L Ann Butler
Defendant: Great American RV Inc, American States Insurance Company, GE Money Bank and American Guardian Warranty Services Inc
Cross Claimant: GE Money Bank
Cross Defendant: Great American RV Inc
Counter Claimant: GE Money Bank
Counter Defendant: Charles Butler and L Ann Butler
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv05516
Filed: August 24, 2009
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Franklin D. Burgess
Referring Judge:
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2011 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 92 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of Rescission and denying 93 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of Reimbursement by Judge Karen L Strombom. Court also denies Defendant's request for sanctions.(TW)
November 9, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by GE Bank by Judge Franklin D. Burgess.(SPH)
December 9, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion to Dismiss American States Insurance Co. by Judge Franklin D. Burgess.(SPH)
December 21, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Motion to Amend Complaint. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint. by Judge Franklin D. Burgess.(SPH)
January 7, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 61 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Recission and, therefore, denying 59 Defendant's Second Motion to Grant Judgment on its counterclaim regarding the deficiency. By Judge Karen L Strombom.(TW)
March 11, 2011 90 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION & ORDER of Dismissal as to American States Only by Judge Karen L Strombom. All of Plaintiffs' claims against American States Ins Co are dismissed w/ prejudice and w/o costs or atty fees.(TW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Butler et al v. Great American RV Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Butler
Represented By: Robert W. Mitchell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L Ann Butler
Represented By: Robert W. Mitchell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American RV Inc
Represented By: Benjamin J Riley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American States Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Money Bank
Represented By: Courtney Renee Beaudoin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Guardian Warranty Services Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: GE Money Bank
Represented By: Courtney Renee Beaudoin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Great American RV Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: GE Money Bank
Represented By: Courtney Renee Beaudoin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Charles Butler
Represented By: Robert W. Mitchell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: L Ann Butler
Represented By: Robert W. Mitchell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]