Ginter v Michael J. Astrue

Plaintiff: Darlene K Ginter
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv05136
Filed: March 2, 2010
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Thurston
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge:
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2011 25 JUDGMENT BY COURT (CMG)
February 4, 2011 24 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 23 Report and Recommendation. The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation (Dkt. 23 ). The matter is therefore REVERSED and REMANDED to the Administration for further consideration. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
January 12, 2011 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 3 Complaint filed by Darlene K Ginter. Noting Date 2/4/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG)
October 19, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. Reply Brief filed 10/18/2010. Oral argument, if desired, requested by 10/25/2010 by Judge J Richard Creatura.(SC)
October 18, 2010 22 REPLY BRIEF by Plaintiff Darlene K Ginter.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex A, # 2 Ex B, # 3 Ex C, # 4 Ex D)(Halpern, Elie)
October 4, 2010 21 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to file REPLY BRIEF by Plaintiff Darlene K Ginter. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order extension reply brief) Noting Date 10/4/2010, (Halpern, Elie)
September 13, 2010 20 RESPONSIVE BRIEF re 11 Brief - Opening by Defendant Michael J Astrue.. (Becia, Franco)
July 30, 2010 19 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint ASSIST US ATTORNEY by Plaintiff Darlene K Ginter on 3/19/10 (Halpern, Elie)
July 30, 2010 18 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint OGC by Plaintiff Darlene K Ginter on 3/19/10 (Halpern, Elie)
July 30, 2010 17 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint ATTORNEY GENERAL by Plaintiff Darlene K Ginter on 3/29/10 (Halpern, Elie)
July 30, 2010 16 DECLARATION OF NET WORTH by Plaintiff Darlene K Ginter. (Halpern, Elie)
July 19, 2010 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Agreed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Responsive Brief due by 9/13/2010, Reply Brief due by 10/4/2010, oral argument, if desired, requested by 10/12/2010, by Judge J Richard Creatura.(SC)
July 14, 2010 14 DECLARATION of Brett E. Eckelbeg filed by Defendant Michael J Astrue re 12 Agreed MOTION to Amend 7 Social Security Briefing Schedule Order,,, (Becia, Franco)
July 14, 2010 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 13 Declaration : This is not a declaration; it is a duplicate of 12 Motion. (HBR)
July 13, 2010 13 FILING ERROR. DECLARATION of Brett E. Eckelberg filed by Defendant Michael J Astrue re 12 Agreed MOTION to Amend 7 Social Security Briefing Schedule Order (Becia, Franco) Modified on 7/14/2010: This document is a duplicate of 12 (HBR).
July 13, 2010 12 Agreed MOTION to Amend 7 Social Security Briefing Schedule Order,,,by Defendant Michael J Astrue. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/13/2010, (Becia, Franco)
June 16, 2010 11 OPENING BRIEF by Plaintiff Darlene K Ginter. (Halpern, Elie)
June 16, 2010 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Franco Luciano Becia on behalf of Defendant Michael J Astrue. (Becia, Franco)
May 20, 2010 9 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This action has been reassigned to Robert J Bryan. All future documents filed in this case must bear the cause number C10-5136RJB and bear the Judge's name in the upper right hand corner of the document. Pursuant to the General Order, entered by the Chief Judge on April 30, 2004, this matter is referred to Magistrate Judge J. Richard Creatura for review and preparation of a Report and Recommendation for the assigned District Judge. Please make the necessary corrections to your records reflecting these changes by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
May 20, 2010 8 SEALED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Defendant Michael J Astrue. (PVO)
May 19, 2010 7 Featured Case ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: The Answer and Administrative Record were filed in this case on 5/18/2010. Counsel shall now conform to the following briefing schedule. The length of the briefing shall conform to Local Rule CR 7(e)(3). Any request for oral argument is to be submitted within 7 days after the due date for plaintiff's reply brief. The Court will defer ruling on the request for oral argument until such time as the Court has reviewed all the briefing and the transcript. Counsel will be notified by Chambers if the request for oral argument is granted. Opening Brief due by 6/16/2010, Responsive Brief due by 7/14/2010, Reply Brief due by 7/28/2010, Oral Argument requested by 8/4/2010, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (SC)
May 18, 2010 6 ANSWER to 3 Complaint by Michael J Astrue.(Lynch, Philip)
April 6, 2010 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Philip H Lynch on behalf of Defendant Michael J Astrue. (Lynch, Philip)
March 5, 2010 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If consent, return the executed form by 5/19/2010. Please Note: Consents must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
March 4, 2010 3 COMPLAINT against defendant Michael J Astrue (Summonses issued and mailed via regular U.S. Mail to Attorney Elie Halpern) (Receipt # None - IFP Granted), filed by Darlene K Ginter. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SC)
March 4, 2010 2 Featured Case ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Judge J Richard Creatura.(SC)
March 2, 2010 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (RE)
March 2, 2010 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Darlene K Ginter. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Halpern, Elie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ginter v Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene K Ginter
Represented By: Elie Halpern
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]