Makarowsky et al v Lobdell, et al

Plaintiff: Sean T Makarowsky, Louise Gast and Tracee Oliver
Defendant: Steve Lobdell, Bryan Acee, Duane McNichols, Clifford Cook and City of Vancouver
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv05423
Filed: June 15, 2010
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clark
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2012 102 Featured Case ORDER granting 101 Stipulated Motion to Compel Washington State Patrol to Produce Toxicology Case File, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
September 6, 2012 129 Featured Case ORDER denying 106 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and for Bifurcation; granting 110 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
October 22, 2012 138 Featured Case ORDER denying 132 Defendant City of Vancouver's Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
November 30, 2010 26 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Plaintiffs' claims against Clifford Cook and Duane McNicholas are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and these defendants are terminated. Other claims remain pending. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
February 2, 2011 53 Featured Case ORDER Granting 51 Stipulation and Order Permitting Withdrawal of Vancouver City Attorney's Office as Counsel of Record for Defendants. Daniel Lloyd shall file a NOA on behalf of defendant's and Counterclaimant promptly. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB)
June 22, 2011 82 Featured Case ORDER Granting 59 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend their Complaint ; Granting 65 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend their Admissions ; Granting in part and Denying in part 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs claims against Offic er Acee are not supported, and the Motion for Summary Judgment dismissing all claims against him is GRANTED. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. #27] on Plaintiffs claims against Officer Lobdell is DENIED. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Makarowsky et al v Lobdell, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean T Makarowsky
Represented By: Beau D Harlan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Gast
Represented By: Beau D Harlan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracee Oliver
Represented By: Beau D Harlan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Lobdell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Acee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane McNichols
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Cook
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vancouver
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]