United States Of America v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Terry L Smith, Louise A. Smith, Blue Bear Company, HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A. and Jefferson County
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv05101
Filed: February 3, 2011
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2012 57 Featured Case ORDER Granting United States' Motion for Relief from Discovery Motion Deadline, signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan.(DK)
April 24, 2012 68 Featured Case ORDER Granting United States' Motion to Reset Mediation Deadlines, signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. 39.1 mediation to be completed by 7/20/2012, 39.1 Settlement Report due by 7/27/2012, Settlement conference to be held by 6/20/2012.(DK)
June 1, 2012 79 Featured Case ORDER granting 70 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copies sent to the Smiths @ Port Townsend address . Modified on 6/1/2012 (JL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States Of America v. Smith et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael P. Hatzimichalis
Represented By: Quinn Patrick Harrington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry L Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louise A. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Bear Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County
Represented By: David W Alvarez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]