Matthews v. Pierce County

Defendant: Pierce County
Plaintiff: Brian David Matthews
Case Number: 3:2011cv05131
Filed: February 14, 2011
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 DISMISSING this matter With Prejudice, signed by Judge Benjamin H Settle. (DN) Modified on 4/1/2011 (DN). (Copy mailed to plaintiff.)
April 4, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT BY COURT (CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
May 5, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 12 Notice of Appeal is not taken in good faith, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 5/5/2011 (DN). (Copy mailed to plaintiff.)
March 8, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(MET) cc: Plaintiff w/ General Order & PLRA

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews v. Pierce County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian David Matthews
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]