Northwest Home Designing, Inc v. Golden Key Construction, Inc. et al

Defendant: Capstone Land Development, Inc., Cornerstone Brokers, Inc., Doug Bateman, William K. Robinson, Deborah S. Robinson, Travis J. Robinson, Thomas E. Whitmore and Golden Key Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: Northwest Home Designing, Inc
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv05289
Filed: April 15, 2011
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2012 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 75 Defendants' Motion to Seal; granting 76 Defendants' Sealed Motion to Compel by Judge J Richard Creatura.(SC)
August 31, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel for Defendants Golden Key Construction, Inc, and Doug Bateman. Attorney Michael David Myers and Ryan C Nute terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(CMG)
September 7, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion to Renote the 30 Joint MOTION for Judgment to Enter Consent Judgment TO: 9/16/2011. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(CMG) Modified on 9/7/2011: copy of Order mailed to Mr. Whitmore on 9/7/11 (CMG).
February 10, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 54 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery by Judge J Richard Creatura.(SC)
April 11, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 64 Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery by Judge J Richard Creatura.(SC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Northwest Home Designing, Inc v. Golden Key Construction, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capstone Land Development, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone Brokers, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Bateman
Represented By: Michael David Myers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William K. Robinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah S. Robinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis J. Robinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Whitmore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Key Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Michael David Myers
Represented By: Ryan C Nute
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Home Designing, Inc
Represented By: Samuel T Bull
Represented By: Anthony J. Biller
Represented By: David Ernest Bennett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]