Eagle Harbor Holdings, LLC, et al v. Ford Motor Company

Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: MediusTech LLC and Eagle Harbor Holdings, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv05503
Filed: June 30, 2011
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Kitsap
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2013 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle denying 127 Motion to limit number of asserted claims. Parties to submit proposed special master and proposed order by 2/20/2013. (TG)
November 13, 2013 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 182 Joint Motion to Revise Case Schedule. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MGC)
November 13, 2013 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 169 Motion to modify and adopt order of the special master regarding claim construction and, granting in part and denying in part 171 Motion to adopt in part and modify in part the special master's claim construction order. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MGC)
November 25, 2013 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 176 Motion to limit number of asserted claims. (TG)
December 11, 2013 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 187 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MGC)
January 27, 2014 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting in part 213 Motion for Discovery.(TG)
March 3, 2014 244 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 237 Motion to Seal by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG)
March 17, 2014 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting in part and denying in part 239 Motion to Strike.(TG)
March 18, 2014 268 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 226 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
April 7, 2014 271 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle re 256 Stipulated MOTION to Seal filed by Ford Motor Company. (TG)
April 28, 2014 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 257 Motion for Discovery by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG)
July 9, 2014 325 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 278 Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend.(TG)
August 12, 2014 335 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 323 Motion for Leave to File; denying 276 Motion for Summary Judgment.(TG)
September 22, 2014 345 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting Claim Constructions by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 333 Notice-Other filed by Lawrence D. Graham. (TG; cc mailed to Mr. Graham)
January 9, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
February 7, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 41 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiffs to file amended complaint no later than 2/24/2012. (TG)
May 2, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle denying 65 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings.(TG)
May 25, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 Motion for Protective Order by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Eagle Harbor Holdings, LLC, et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MediusTech LLC
Represented By: Ian B Crosby
Represented By: Parker C Folse, III
Represented By: Floyd G Short
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eagle Harbor Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Parker C Folse, III
Represented By: Ian B Crosby
Represented By: Floyd G Short
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]