T-Mobile USA, Inc. v. Terry et al

Defendant: George E. Collett, Matthew Collett, Marilou Collett, Sarah M. Hoffman, Sherman Terry, Custom Access, Inc., John Does 1-10, XYZ Companies 1-10 and Sandra Ortiz
Plaintiff: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv05655
Filed: August 18, 2011
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2011 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 94 Motion to Lift Injunction; denying 95 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(CMG; cc to Defendants via mail)
October 25, 2011 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 98 George Collett's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 99 Marilou Collett's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 100 Sarah Hoffman's Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying 106 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 10/25/2011 (DN). (Copies mailed to George and Marilou Collett, Mathew Collett and Sarah Hoffman.)
April 2, 2012 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 138 Motion for Order to Show Cause; denying 150 Defendant Collette's Motion for Order; denying 157 Defendant Collette's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/11/2012 at 10:00 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Show Cause Response due by 4/4/2012. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 4/2/2012 (DN). (copies mailed to defendants Marilou, Sarah and Matthew Collett)
April 23, 2012 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Partial Summary Judgment and PERMANENT INJUNCTION against Defendant George Collett; JUDGMENT in favor of T-Mobile USA, Inc. against George E Collett; Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 4/23/2012 (DN). (cc's mailed to Matthew & Marilou Collett, and Sarah Hoffman.)
July 17, 2012 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 166 Second MOTION for Sanctions filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc., signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 7/17/2012 (DN). (cc to Marilou Collett; Matthew Collett; and Sarah Hoffman)
July 17, 2012 188 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANTS in favor of Plaintiff T-Mobile USA, Inc. against Custom Access, Inc., George E Collett, Marilou Collett, Matthew Collett, Sandra Ortiz, Sarah M. Hoffman, Sherman Terry, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 7/17/2012 (DN). (cc to Marilou Collett; Matthew Collett; and Sarah Hoffman)
September 7, 2012 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 189 Marilou Collette's Motion to Vacate ; finding as moot 190 George Collett's Motion to Sever. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 9/7/2012 (DN). (ccs to Marilou Collett, Matthew Collett, Sarah Hoffman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: T-Mobile USA, Inc. v. Terry et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George E. Collett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Collett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilou Collett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah M. Hoffman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherman Terry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custom Access, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Companies 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Ortiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Baldinger
Represented By: James C. Grant
Represented By: Gail Podolsky
Represented By: Stacey K. Sutton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]