ThermaPure, Inc. v. Water Out Oregon et al

Plaintiff: ThermaPure, Inc.
Defendant: Water Out Oregon and Water Out of Oregon, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv05958
Filed: November 18, 2011
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2012 38 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle RENOTING 17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Water Out of Oregon, Inc., Water Out Oregon; Noting Date 10/26/2012. (TG)
November 13, 2012 51 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 17 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Joint Status Report due by 12/1/2012.(TG)
December 3, 2012 56 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle denying 52 Motion for Reconsideration.(TG)
January 16, 2013 72 Featured Case ORDER that ThermaPure's motion to strike (dkt 61) is GRANTED, and WOO's Motion for Attorney Fees 57 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(CMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ThermaPure, Inc. v. Water Out Oregon et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ThermaPure, Inc.
Represented By: Philip S McCune
Represented By: Lawrence Carl Locker
Represented By: Sean M Kneafsey
Represented By: Shaun Swiger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Water Out Oregon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Water Out of Oregon, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]