BP West Coast Products LLC v. SKR Inc et al

Plaintiff: BP West Coast Products LLC
Defendant: SKR Inc and Sherif K. Riad
Thirdparty_plaintiff: SKR Inc
Thirdparty_defendant: BP West Coast Products LLC
Counter_claimant: SKR Inc
Counter_defendant: BP West Coast Products LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv06074
Filed: December 30, 2011
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15:2801
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2013 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 91 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on their claims by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD, mailed copy of order to pro se parties)
October 22, 2013 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Granting Summary Judgment to BPWCP on Counterclaims, Denying Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Counterclaims, and Denying Motion to Amend Motion to Vountarily Dismiss Counterclaims. 92 106 122 by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
September 10, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss; granting 29 Counter-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
October 17, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Plaintiff BP's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Order of Ejectment, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BP West Coast Products LLC v. SKR Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BP West Coast Products LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Represented By: Kent Michael Fandel
Represented By: Douglas Clayton Berry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKR Inc
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherif K. Riad
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Represented By: Adam T Birnbaum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: SKR Inc
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: BP West Coast Products LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Represented By: Douglas Clayton Berry
Represented By: Kent Michael Fandel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: SKR Inc
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: BP West Coast Products LLC
Represented By: Kent Michael Fandel
Represented By: Douglas Clayton Berry
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]