Berg et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Cheryl Berg and Shani Berry
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Spaulding Lighting
Case Number: 3:2012cv05076
Filed: January 27, 2012
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Authorizing The Guardian Ad Litem to Retain Counsel, signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan.(DK)
January 17, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE SHANI BERRY AS PLAINTIFF, by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (cc: Shani Berry @ Everett address.)(DK)
January 23, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT WAL-MART STORES, INC,'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, denying 36 . The parties are granted an additional thirty (30) days to complete discovery. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
February 5, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CLAIMS AGAINST SPAULDING LIGHTING, INC. AND DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT SPAULDING LIGHTING'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, denying 33 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 47 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan.(JL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berg et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Berg
Represented By: Stanley Jay Rumbaugh
Represented By: Teri Lynn Rideout
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shani Berry
Represented By: Stanley Jay Rumbaugh
Represented By: Teri Lynn Rideout
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Cecilia S. Rikard
Represented By: Virginia Leeper
Represented By: Jose Edward Gaitan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spaulding Lighting
Represented By: Kelly P Corr
Represented By: Sarah E Tilstra
Represented By: William Harrison Walsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]