Boyer, et al v. Reed Smith LLP

Defendant: James J Barnes, LMJ Enterprises LLC and Reed Smith LLP
Plaintiff: James Patrick Boyer and Catherine Boyer
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv05815
Filed: September 12, 2012
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS 16 , signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Attorneys Christopher M. Veley, Philip J Nelson, and Darian A Stanford added for Plaintiffs Catherine Boyer and James Patrick Boyer. Attorney Larry E Hazen terminated. (GMR)
June 10, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANTS, granting in part 32 Motion to Compel. On or before June 21, 2013, Defendants must provide a valid privilege log. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
October 21, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT REED SMITH'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING SCOPE OF RULE 30(B)(6) DEPOSITION, granting 52 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
November 19, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, denying 61 . Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Boyer, et al v. Reed Smith LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J Barnes
Represented By: Renee E Rothauge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LMJ Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Renee E Rothauge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Smith LLP
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Patrick Boyer
Represented By: Larry E Hazen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Boyer
Represented By: Larry E Hazen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]