Hausken v. Lewis et al

Plaintiff: Phillip Burton Hausken
Defendant: D Lewis, Joyce Morrell and Dawn Thompson
Case Number: 3:2012cv05882
Filed: October 2, 2012
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: King
Referring Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE-REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Creatura by Judge Benjamin H Settle. (TG; cc mailed to plaintiff)
June 11, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the proposed amendment would be futile and the Court DENIES plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint 29 . Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
June 11, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
July 3, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion to Amend signed by Judge J Richard Creatura.(MET) cc: Plaintiff w/complaint form.
September 12, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND DECLINING TO ADOPT IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H Settle re 23 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Dawn Thompson, D Lewis, Joyce Morrell, 22 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Phillip Burton Hausken. (TG; cc mailed to plaintiff)
November 5, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge J Richard Creatura. Show Cause Response due by 12/13/2013. (MET) cc: plaintiff
March 4, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 Motion to strike Plaintiff's motion for default. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
May 12, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H Settle re 50 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Dawn Thompson, D Lewis, Joyce Morrell. Case is re-referred to Judge Creatura. (TG; cc mailed to plaintiff)
May 30, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying 63 Motion for Reconsideration.(TG; cc mailed to plaintiff)
June 17, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 54 and 59 Motions to Appoint Counsel signed by Judge J Richard Creatura.(MET) cc: plaintiff
September 16, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 70 Motion to Set Aside Default and Entering a Schedule Order by Judge J Richard Creatura. Discovery completed by 11/28/2014 and Dispositive motions are due by 12/19/2014. (MET) cc: plaintiff

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hausken v. Lewis et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Burton Hausken
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Lewis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Morrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]