Stellar J Corporation v. Unison Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Stellar J Corporation
Defendant: Unison Solutions, Inc. and Argonaut Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv05982
Filed: November 14, 2012
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Cowlitz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2014 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 121 Defendant Unison Solutions' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Plaintiff is to file an Amended Complaint to allege specifics within 21 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
February 12, 2015 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Stellar J's Various Motions and on Argonaut's Motion for Separate Trial Phases by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB)
March 17, 2015 288 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 174 Motion ; granting 196 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 201 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 204 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 210 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 215 Motion for Joinder; denying 218 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 219 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 224 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 227 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 230 Motion ; denying 239 Motion for Joinder; denying 252 Motion. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
April 11, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Defendant Unison's Motion to Dismiss; denying 21 Defendant Argonaut's Motion to Dismiss; granting 22 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Counsel is instructed to e-file the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
April 16, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 72 Defendant Argonaut's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stellar J Corporation v. Unison Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stellar J Corporation
Represented By: Jamila A Johnson
Represented By: Joseph John Straus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unison Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argonaut Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.