Smith v. Washington State Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Scott C. Smith
Defendant: Washington State Department of Corrections and John Does One thru Ten
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv05138
Filed: February 27, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Mason
Referring Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 97 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Scott C. Smith; GRANTING Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 3/3/2014 (DN). (cc to pltf)
June 6, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response will be due on or before June 28, 2013. Defendants' reply will be due on July 19, 2013. The clerk's office is directed to re-note the 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment for 7/19/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
July 3, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 23 Motion to Amend Complaint. In light of this order, defendants shall inform the Court whether or not they wish to have the Court consider the currently pending motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 12), or if defendants wish to withdraw the motion. Defendants' shall inform the Court of their decision on or before the July 19, 2013 noting date for consideration of the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
October 28, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 56 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Scott C. Smith; plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief is denied. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 10/28/2013 (DN). (cc to pltf)
November 5, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 53 Motion for Non-Stenographic Depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
December 9, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 76 denying plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis with an interlocutory appeal. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 12/9/2013 (DN). (cc to pltf)
January 31, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 94 Motion for Reconsideration of the 91 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Smith v. Washington State Department of Corrections et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott C. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Corrections
Represented By: Eric C. Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does One thru Ten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]