Cruze v. Warner et al

Defendant: Laura Paul, Eldon Vail, Tim Thrasher, Bernie Warner, Gina Cone, Pat Glebe, Mark Kucza, Candace Germear, Stephen Sinclair and Unknown Defendants 1-5
Plaintiff: Schawn James Cruze
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv05220
Filed: March 22, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Thurston
Referring Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2014 114 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H Settle re 103 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Schawn James Cruze. (TG; cc mailed to plaintiff)
May 10, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Motion to Amend/supplement the complaint. The Court orders that the two pages attached to ECF No. 21, labeled 3-E and 3-G, will be supplements to the original complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
May 16, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER re 20 Letter re retaliation, and 23 Letter requesting time to try and reach settlement: Plaintiff's two letters will remain in the file, but the Court will take no further action on those documents and the two letters will not otherwise be considered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
June 13, 2013 37 Featured Case ORDER granting 27 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Victor M Minjares terminated, Janelle Carman added for defendant Laura Paul only, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(MET) cc: plaintiff
July 3, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER denying 29 Motion for Leave signed by Judge J Richard Creatura.(MET) cc: plaintiff
July 11, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER denying 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel and Directing Plaintiff to Show Cause signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. The Court orders plaintiff to show cause and inform the Court what steps he has taken to obtain the information he alleges the Department of Corrections has withheld from him. Plaintiffs response to this order will be due on or before August 16, 2013.(MET) cc: plaintiff
July 24, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER denying 41 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge J Richard Creatura.(MET) cc: plaintiff
September 10, 2013 51 Featured Case ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS 44 , 45 and 47 signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (MET) cc: plaintiff
September 17, 2013 54 Featured Case ORDER granting 52 , 53 Motions for Protective Order signed by Judge J Richard Creatura.(MET) cc: plaintiff
December 24, 2013 96 Featured Case ORDER granting 57 Motion for Discovery; denying 58 Motion for Protective Order; denying 59 Motion to Amend; granting 62 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 66 Motion to strike plaintiff's deposition; Plaintiff's 75 Motion to Dismiss is RENOTED for 12/27/13; denying 81 Motion for Summary Judgment; and striking 92 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
December 30, 2013 97 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H Settle re 95 Report and Recommendations. (TG; cc mailed to plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cruze v. Warner et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Paul
Represented By: Victor M Minjares
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldon Vail
Represented By: Victor M Minjares
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Thrasher
Represented By: Victor M Minjares
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernie Warner
Represented By: Victor M Minjares
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Cone
Represented By: Victor M Minjares
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Glebe
Represented By: Victor M Minjares
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kucza
Represented By: Victor M Minjares
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candace Germear
Represented By: Victor M Minjares
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Sinclair
Represented By: Victor M Minjares
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendants 1-5
Represented By: Victor M Minjares
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schawn James Cruze
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]