Chester v. Smartreceipt, Inc et al

Defendant: Eric Kanowsky, Smartreceipt, Inc and Michael Howe
Plaintiff: Molly Chester
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv05272
Filed: April 10, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 11 Stipulated Motion to extend time for filing answer. (TG)
August 21, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 24 Stipulated Motion to Extend Stay. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/10/2013, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/10/2013, Joint Status Report due by 9/10/2013.(TG)
November 19, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle re 49 Stipulation filed by Molly Chester. Defendants Michael Howe and Eric Kanowsky terminated. (TG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Chester v. Smartreceipt, Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Kanowsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smartreceipt, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Howe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Chester
Represented By: Stephanie L Bloomfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]