Lynch v. Department of Corrections

Plaintiff: Robert Shawn Lynch
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2013cv05289
Filed: April 15, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Thurston
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Referring Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
November 26, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time: Discovery to be completed by 3/14/2014, Dispositive motions due by 5/9/2014, and the Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
April 24, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS, signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (GMR- cc: via ECF WA DOC Trust Account Office; hard copy to pltf)
April 24, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO AMEND OR SHOW CAUSE with Response due by 5/31/2013, signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (Attachments: # 1 1983 Complaint Form, # 2 General Order)(GMR- cc: pltf)
June 4, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by 1st Class Mail; mailed on 6/4/13 to Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff w/Gen'l Order)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynch v. Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Shawn Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.