Sanchez-Galvez v. US Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al

Plaintiff: Juan Jose Sanchez-Galvez
Defendant: US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, C Vincent and Koby Williams
Case Number: 3:2013cv05308
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Referring Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion for a speedy trial. Signed by Magistratre Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
January 2, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H Settle re 18 Report and Recommendations. (TG)
May 2, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
May 3, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to file an Amended 6 Complaint. Amended Complaint due by 6/14/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff w/blank forms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez-Galvez v. US Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Jose Sanchez-Galvez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koby Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.