Shackelford v. Mason County Jail

Defendant: Mason County Jail
Plaintiff: Izak Shackelford
Case Number: 3:2013cv05326
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Mason
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Referring Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion for order authorizing it to file copies of kites from the Plaintiff. Defendant's blanket request for authorization to file any other inmate records it deems relevant is DENIED. Signed by Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
October 28, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H Settle re 21 Report and Recommendations. (TG; cc mailed to plaintiff)
May 1, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS, signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
May 1, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by 1st Class Mail; mailed on 5/1/13 to Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (CMG; cc Pltf w/Gen'l order)
May 2, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shackelford v. Mason County Jail
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason County Jail
Represented By: Guy Bogdanovich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Izak Shackelford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]