United States of America v. Barber et al

Defendant: Lori Thompson, Bert Barber and Linda Barber
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2013cv05539
Filed: July 1, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Cowlitz
Presiding Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2014 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion for Relief from deadline; granting in part and denying in part 75 Motion to Continue Discovery Deadline; granting in part and denying in part 77 Motion to Compel.(TG)
October 2, 2014 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking 84 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(TG)
October 7, 2014 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying 79 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 81 Motion for Summary Judgment.(TG)
November 4, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 22 Stipulated Protective Order filed by United States of America. (TG)
June 4, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 41 Motion for Leave to File; granting 28 Motion to Enforce Subpoena; denying 30 Motion to Quash.(TG)
June 17, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 42 Motion to Compel; denying 43 Motion for Protective Order.(TG)
July 9, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion to Compel. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 7/31/2014.(TG)
July 31, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 64 Motion for Reconsideration by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(TG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Barber et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bert Barber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Barber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Represented By: Carrie Pagnucco
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]