English v. Clark County Jail et al

Plaintiff: Timothy R English
Defendant: Clark County Jail, Garry Lucas and Jackie Batties
Case Number: 3:2014cv05328
Filed: April 21, 2014
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clark
Referring Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by 1st Class Mail; mailed on 6/5/14 to Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG; cc to Clark County Prosecutor & Plaintiff w/instruction sheet)
October 21, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
January 22, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Court will defer ruling on these two motions, and address these issues in the Report and Recommendation on defendants' motion for summary judgment that is noted for consideration on 1/23/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
April 14, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 44 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Timothy R English; the Court dismisses this action for failure to exhaust administrative remedies as to all but one claim; the Court dismisses the remaining claim based on the running of the statute of limitations; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 4/14/2015 (DN). (cc to pltf)
May 2, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
May 2, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff file an Amended 7 Complaint. Amended complaint due on or before June 6, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: English v. Clark County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy R English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garry Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Batties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.