Troupe v. Kapa et al

Plaintiff: David Troupe
Defendant: Adam Kapa, Daniel Wistie, Richard Hayward, Sorsby, Andrew Williams and Edwin Hoskins
Case Number: 3:2014cv05529
Filed: July 1, 2014
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Mason
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Referring Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the 22 Motion to stay discovery and striking the 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' may re-file their motion following the completion of discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
April 1, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 28 MOTION to allow Discovery at the Public's expense is DENIED; and Plaintiff's 29 MOTION for Extension of Time is GRANTED in part; the discovery deadline is extended until 5/15/2015 and the dispositive motions deadline is extended until 7/17/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff) Modified on 4/1/2015 (CMG).
April 13, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 34 DISMISSING with prejudice Defendant Sorsby; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 4/13/2015 (DN). (cc to pltf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Troupe v. Kapa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Troupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Kapa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Wistie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hayward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]