United States of America v. Bennett

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Karen Bennett
Case Number: 3:2014mc05002
Filed: February 21, 2014
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Karen L Strombom granting 9 Motion for Order to Show Cause Regarding Contempt of Court. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/11/2014 at 10:00 AM in F Courtroom before Judge Karen L Strombom.(MET) cc: USMO
July 9, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a bench warrant shall be issued for Respondents immediate arrest pursuant to 26 U.S.C. 7604(b) signed by Judge Karen L Strombom. (MET)
July 22, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on the 22 MOTION U.S.' Withdrawal of Petition to Enforce IRS Summons re 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America. Noting Date 7/22/2014, signed by Judge Karen L Strombom. (MET)
July 22, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 23 Report and Recommendations. (TG)
February 21, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom and DIRECTING Respondent to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Benjamin H Settle. (CMG)
March 17, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on the 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America. Noting Date 3/17/2014, signed by Judge Karen L Strombom. (MET)
March 17, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Enforcement of Summons, signed by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff via Certified Mail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bennett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Christina Nicole Dimock(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Karen Bennett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]