Corson v Mattox et al

Plaintiff: David C. Corson
Defendant: Paul A Mattox, Jr. and Roger Propst
Case Number: 1:2009cv00065
Filed: May 15, 2009
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Clarksburg Office
County: Calhoun
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 29:0794 Job Discrimination (Handicap)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2010 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY, GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DKT. NO. 99 ,DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS APPEAL DKT. NOS. 101 , 105 , AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO CEASE FILING FURTHER MOTIONS OR BRIEFS. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 7/21/2010. (Copy counsel of record via CM/ECF. Pro Se Plaintiff via certified mail)(jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/21/2010: # 1 receipt) (jmm).
September 29, 2010 111 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DKT. NO. 86 , GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND THE PLEADINGS DKT. NO. 42 , DENYING PLAINTIFFS SECOND MOTION TO AMEND THE PLEADINGS DKT. NO. 78 , DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DKT. NO. 15 , GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS DKT. NOS. 12 , 31 , AND DISMISSING LAWSUIT WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/29/2010. (Copy counsel of record via CM/ECF, pro se plaintiff via certified mail)(jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2010: # 1 receipt) (jmm).
January 21, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER/OPINION; GRANTS 3 Motion To Allow Additional Evidence; GRANTS 40 Motion to Strike ; GRANTS 41 Motion to Strike; DENIES without prejudice, as premature 44 Motion to Strike ; GRANTS 46 Motion to Strike ; GRANTS 49 Plaintiff's Moti on ; DENIES without prejudice, as premature 50 Motion For Protective Medical Orders; GRANTS 73 Motion to Strike. Docket Entries 54 , 55 , 35 , 33 are stricken. Docket Entry 43 is DENIED AS WITHDRAWN as regards the "Motion To Compel". Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 1/21/2010. (Copy counsel of record via CM/ECF and pro se plaintiff via certified mail)(jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2010: # 1 receipt) (jmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corson v Mattox et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Corson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul A Mattox, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Propst
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]