Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, Inc. v. Parmer et al

Plaintiff: Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Betty Parmer and Secure US, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00088
Filed: May 22, 2012
 
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Clarksburg Office
County: Monongalia
Presiding Judge: Frederick P. Stamp
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2014 127 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND DENYING DEFENDANT MITCH BROZIK'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Secure US, Inc.'s counterclaim 96 is GRAN TED, and Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion in the Alternative to Dismiss the Counterclaim 96 is DENIED AS MOOT. Further, defendant Mitch Brozik's Motion to Dismiss 88 is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 2/21/2014. (copy to counsel of record via CM/ECF) (nmm)
April 14, 2014 144 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BROZIK'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The Court denies Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, Inc.'s [1 01] Motion for Summary Judgment; denies Mitch Brozik's 104 Motion for Summary Judgment and denies Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, Inc.'s 118 Motion to Strike memorandum of Secure US, Inc. purporting to join in Mitch Brozik's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 4/14/14. (mh)
May 22, 2014 166 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, Inc.'s motion for voluntary dismissal ECF No. 147 is GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that this civil action be DISMISSED AND STRICKEN from the active docket of this Court. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 5/22/14. (mh)
September 5, 2014 194 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER OF SALE AND OVERRULING DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS. The Court overrules the Defendant Brozik's 191 Objections to Order Granting Motion for Sale of Assets and the 192 Suppl emental Objection and adopts the Magistrate Judge's 186 Order Granting Motion for Sale of Assets and 187 Amended Order Attaching Notice of Sale to Order Granting Motion for Sale of Assets. The sale shall proceed at the time and place designated in said orders. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 9/5/14. (mh)
September 29, 2014 210 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OVERRULING INTERVENOR'S OBJECTIONS AND AFFIRMING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REQUIRE NON-SOLICITATION AGREEMENT AND DENYING IN PART MOTION LIMITING DISCLOSURE OF COMPETIT IVE INFORMATION. Guardian's objections to the magistrate judge's order granting in part plaintiff's 199 motion to require a non-solicitation agreement and denying in part the limiting of disclosure of competitive information 204 are OVERRULED. Thus, this Court AFFIRMS the magistrate judge's order. The sale shall proceed at the time and place designated in the order readvertising and rescheduling the sale of assets by Magistrate Judge Seibert 209 . Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 9/29/2014. (kd)
October 20, 2014 230 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF SECURITY ALARM FINANCING ENTERPRISES, INC. AND DEFENDANT BETTY PARMER'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ADJOURNMENT OF JUDICIAL SALE, SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART AS MOOT PLAINTIFF SECURITY ALARM FINANCING ENTERPRISES, INC. AND DEFENDANT BETTY PARMER'S OBJECTIONS, VACATING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER DENYING THE POSTPONEMENT OF THE SALE, VACATING THE JUDICIAL SALE OF ASSETS AND DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT MITCH BROZIK'S MOTION TO ESCROW: It is ORDERED that the 225 Emergency Motion to the extent it seeks adjournment of the judicial sale to pursue a private sale is GRANTED; the 224 Joint Objections to the extent that SAFE should have been permitted to postpone or adjour n the judicial sale to pursue a private sale of the subject assets are SUSTAINED; the 219 Order denying the joint motion for postponement of sale is VACATED; and the 216 Motion to escrow the proceeds of the sale is DENIED AS MOOT. Further, all o ther objections filed are OVERRULED AS MOOT. The sale of assets that occurred on 10/7/14 is VACATED and the Clerk is DIRECTED to refund to Select Security the deposit paid for the assets. The judicial sale is ADJOURNED for 60 days. On or before that time, SAFE shall submit a report to this Court advising it of the status of the case. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 10/20/14. (cnd)
February 15, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT SECURE US, INC.S 11 MOTION TO DISMISS, GRANTING DEFENDANT BETTY PARMERS 21 MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT,DENYING PLAINTIFFS 20 MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS MOOT AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 32 MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT. Clerk directed to file amended complaint. Plaintiff directed to serve the amended complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 2/15/13. (cc)
October 31, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT MITCH BROZIKS 75 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT on or before November 21, 2013. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 10/31/2013. (kac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, Inc. v. Parmer et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory J. Krock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Parmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secure US, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon J. Kupec
Represented By: Thomas W. Kupec
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]